# Vedic Math

Recap of the vertical and crosswise method of multiplication.

Published: 25th October 2013 12:34 PM  |   Last Updated: 25th October 2013 12:35 PM   |  A+A-

We have seen in the last two articles multiplication of two two-digit numbers and of two three-digit numbers. What if we want to multiply a two-digit number and a three-digit number using the same method? Just put a zero before the two-digit number and follow the same method.

Example:

123 x 45

We make that 123 x 045

Step 1 : Multiply the units digits

3 x 5 =15

Step 2 : Multiply the units and tens  digit crosswise and add

(2 x 5) + (4 x 3) = 22

Step 3 : Multiply the hundreds and units digits crosswise, the tens digits vertically, and add all

(1 x 5) + (3 x 0) + (4 x 2) = 13

Step 4 : Multiply the tens and hundreds digits crosswise and add

(1 x 4) + (2 x 0) = 4

Step 5 : Multiply the hundreds digits vertically

1 x 0 = 0

Now you can try the following:

a. 45 x 23

b. 26 x 89

c. 67 x 34

d. 86 x 51

e. 126 x 213

f. 164 x 519

g. 261 x 52

h. 651 x 43

i. 168 x 62

j. 48 x 341

Blaise Pascal was the son of an accountant. His father advised him not to study mathematics, which was a difficult subject. But Pascal continued his mathematical studies and at the age of 12 he proved that the sum of the angles in a triangle is equal to two right angles.

Along with Fermat, Pascal came up with the calculus of probabilities, which later led to the foundation of mathematical theory of probabilities.

Honouring his work and contribution, the name Pascal has been made the SI unit of pressure and also a programming language.

His other notable contributions include Pascal’s law, Pascal’s triangle and Pascal’s wager.

Stay up to date on all the latest Bengaluru news with The New Indian Express App. Download now
(Get the news that matters from New Indian Express on WhatsApp. Click this link and hit 'Click to Subscribe'. Follow the instructions after that.)