Vedic Math

Published: 17th October 2014 06:12 AM  |   Last Updated: 17th October 2014 06:12 AM   |  A+A-

KUMUDHAKRISHNAN.jpg

Special multiplication methods

We know the normal method to multiply any two numbers using our tables. But is it necessary to stick to the same method always? Not at all. Just by looking at the numbers we must try to multiply them in our mind. That is the objective of vedic maths. Let us look at a special method of multiplication.

Today we look at a method to find the product of two-digit numbers with the same first digit and the sum of the second digits is 10. Number pairs like 11 and 19, 12 and 18, 23 and 27 are examples of numbers which have the same tens digit and whose units digits add up to 10.

Let us break down this method into the following steps.

 Multiply the tens digit (same for both) by the next consecutive number. That will be the first part of our answer.

 Multiply the units digits of the two numbers. That will be the second part of the answer.

 We have to remember that it is similar to the Nikhilam method, which has a base number and where the number of digits in the answer is decided by the number of zeros in the base.

 For two-digit numbers we take 100 as the base, so the number of digits should be two. In particular we have to stick to the number of digits in the second part of the answer. Otherwise the answer may go wrong.

Example: 33 X 37

The tens digit of both numbers is 3 and the sum of the units digits is 10.

 Multiply 3 (the tens digit) by the next number 4.

3 x 4 = 12. This is the first part of the answer.

 Multiply the units digits.

3 x 7 = 21.  This is the second part of the answer. 

 Therefore, 33 x 37 = 1221

Let us look at some more examples.

22 x 28

 Multiply 2 (the tens digit) by the next number 3.

2 x 3 = 6. This is the first part of the answer.

 Multiply the units digits.

2 x 8 = 16.  This is the second part of the answer. 

 Therefore, 22 x 28 = 616

81 x 89

 Multiply 8 (the tens digit) by the next number 9.

8 x 9 = 72. This is the first part of the answer.

 Multiply the units digits.

1 x 9 = 09.  This is the second part of the answer. 

 Therefore, 81 x 89 = 7209

Remember that the product of the units digits, 9, has to be written as 09 to maintain the number of digits in the answer.

Now problems for you to try:

 12 x 18

 43 X 47

 76 X 74

 98 X 92

 67 X 63

Stay up to date on all the latest Bengaluru news with The New Indian Express App. Download now
(Get the news that matters from New Indian Express on WhatsApp. Click this link and hit 'Click to Subscribe'. Follow the instructions after that.)

Comments

Disclaimer : We respect your thoughts and views! But we need to be judicious while moderating your comments. All the comments will be moderated by the newindianexpress.com editorial. Abstain from posting comments that are obscene, defamatory or inflammatory, and do not indulge in personal attacks. Try to avoid outside hyperlinks inside the comment. Help us delete comments that do not follow these guidelines.

The views expressed in comments published on newindianexpress.com are those of the comment writers alone. They do not represent the views or opinions of newindianexpress.com or its staff, nor do they represent the views or opinions of The New Indian Express Group, or any entity of, or affiliated with, The New Indian Express Group. newindianexpress.com reserves the right to take any or all comments down at any time.

flipboard facebook twitter whatsapp